DELAINE HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain a museum for the benefit of the public dedicated to preserving, promoting and displaying in perpetuity the collection of heritage buses, photographs, documents, artefacts and memorabilia of Delaine Buses Ltd of Bourne, Lincolnshire, one of England's oldest independent Bus Operators for the purpose of education, reference, research and general interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY DELAINE-SMITH | Chair | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN DELAINE-SMITH | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN DELAINE-SMITH | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARK DELAINE-SMITH | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £16.33k | £10.46k | £12.76k | £249.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.61k | £4.51k | £6.38k | £6.28k | £7.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC DEDICATED TO PRESERVING, PROMOTING AND DISPLAYING IN PERPETUITY INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE COLLECTION OF HERITAGE BUSES, PHOTOGRAPHS, DOCUMENTS, ARTEFACTS AND MEMORABILIA OF DELAINE BUSES LTD FOR THE PURPOSE OF EDUCATION, REFERENCE, RESEARCH AND GENERAL INTEREST.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 SPALDING ROAD
BOURNE
LINCOLNSHIRE
PE10 9LE
- Phone:
- 01778422866
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window