Y GANOLFAN LLWYNGWRIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings, facilities and open space for use by the various local organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 25 September 1987: Standard registration
- LLWYNGWRIL VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Bryan | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hands | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wilma Senior | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Huw Davies | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dilys Williams | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Thomas | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Griffiths | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Carroll | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Baxter | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pam Osborne | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Dyer | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Marsha Van Den Bogaard | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sue Hamlin | Trustee | 05 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR GERAINT EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.39k | £12.37k | £3.36k | £11.14k | £7.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.52k | £3.38k | £6.11k | £27.01k | £9.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 March 2023 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27 FEBRUARY 1970, AMENDED BY SCHEME 7 NOVEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF LLWYNGWRIL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATON AN LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
LLWYNGWRIL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Y Ganolfan
LLWYNGWRIL
Gwynedd
LL37 2JB
- Phone:
- 01341250062
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window