ENFIELD CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Enfield Caribbean Association was founded in 1986 to promote the interests, wellbeing and quality of life for the residents of the London Borough of Enfield, particularly those of Caribbean descent, through partnership work with Enfield Council, voluntary organisations and individuals with a shared interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
Governance
- 27 October 2015: CIO registration
- 27 September 2016: Funds received from 1064045 ENFIELD CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oveta McInnis Ms | Chair | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claudette Ebanks Ms | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Phillips Mr | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Edwards Mr | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cedric Anthony Levy | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bevin Betton | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.12k | £36.17k | £31.77k | £27.30k | £42.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.57k | £13.29k | £13.12k | £37.27k | £45.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £3.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF ENFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS, PARTICULARLY THOSE OF CARIBBEAN DESCENT, IN ASSOCIATION WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, RESIDENTS AND OTHERS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROMOTE HEALTH AND WELLBEING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMMUNITY HOUSE
311 FORE STREET
LONDON
N9 0PZ
- Phone:
- 020 8373 6388
- Email:
- info@theeca.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window