Muhammadia Saifia Education Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Organisation provides an educational centre for promotion of the Islamic faith in the Oldham area. This will be for the benefit of the public through the holding of prayer meetings, teaching facilities, lectures, meditation meetings, public celebration of religious festivals, celebration of Saints and the distribution of literature on Islamic belies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
Governance
- 07 November 2016: CIO registration
- SAIFI ISLAMIC EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SOHAIL LIAQAT BSC HONS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAJID AMIN | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
WAQAR ALI LLB-HONS | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.35k | £23.07k | £32.98k | £33.29k | £32.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.27k | £8.54k | £27.11k | £29.38k | £23.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 March 2025 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 March 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
22 March 2024 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 February 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2016 as amended on 03 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
THE ORGANISATION OBJECTS (“THE OBJECTS”) ARE: • THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. • THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. • THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY INCLUDING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BETWEEN MUSLIMS AND NON-MUSLIMS IN ORDER TO FOSTER MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND TOLERATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Muhammadia Saifia Education Trust
120 Waterloo Street
OLDHAM
OL4 1EU
- Phone:
- 07515275315
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window