Accounts and annual returns THE NEWCASTLE EMLYN AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506851
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 April 2025 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 April 2025 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 April 2025 439 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 April 2025 439 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 July 2023 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 July 2023 171 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 March 2021 56 days late Download Open in new window