Financial history THE NEWCASTLE EMLYN AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506851
Charity reporting is up to date (73 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £152.82k £172.13k £146.08k £160.97k £199.51k
Total expenditure £165.60k £115.68k £160.07k £179.07k £194.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £65.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.00k £170.83k N/A £66.00k £65.00k