Latin America for Christ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Serving the church in Latin America and the Caribbean, particularly in word ministry without forgetting the wider needs of the church. We support the church by: Biblical languages training (Hebrew and Greek, in partnership with Tyndale House, Cambridge) and MOCLAM (Moore College Extension in Latin America), as well as ad hoc support for churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Argentina
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Chile
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- Mexico
- Nicaragua
- Panama
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
Governance
- 28 January 2016: CIO registration
- CUBA FOR CHRIST (Working name)
- CUBA PARA CRISTO (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Carl Michael Chambers | Chair | 28 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
Richard John Barnardo Wallace | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Daniel Justin Paton Kirk | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Heather Shuk Ping Lim | Trustee | 31 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
VANESSA CLAUDIA Sanchez Duenas | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.38k | £15.95k | £57.39k | £12.81k | £1.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.05k | £15.51k | £60.78k | £20.49k | £14.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 March 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 28 Jan 2016 as amended on 02 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PARTICULARLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN CUBA; AND 4.2 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Curates Walk
DARTFORD
KENT
DA2 7BJ
- Phone:
- 07886375245
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window