The Square Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health Care in Sub-Saharan Africa through pharmacy education. The Foundation 1. has assisted assisted students who have been accepted to pharmacy school but do not have adequate funding. 2.established an e-learning program for continuing professional development of pharmacists To date, the Foundation has been active in Ethiopia, Zimbabwe, Namibia, Malawi and Botswana
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Botswana
- Malawi
- Namibia
Governance
- 08 January 2016: CIO registration
- The Square Academy (Working name)
- The Square Foundation (Working name)
- THE SQUARE ALUMNI FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP HARRISON | Chair | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Lortal | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zoe DAVENPORT | Trustee | 16 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.00k | £11.00k | £7.00k | £20.00k | £19.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £13.00k | £6.88k | £19.36k | £19.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 November 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Jan 2016 as amended on 19 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS STUDYING PHARMACY IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS BY COOPERATING WITH SCHOOLS OF PHARMACY AND FUNDING FOR UNDERGRADUATE STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Allee des Brises du Fleuve
306
Verdun
Quebec
H4G 3M9
- Phone:
- +15148625430
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window