THE JONNY WILKINSON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We wish to develop and deliver a program to raise the profile of mental wellbeing in young people in positive and engaging ways. We aim to help both increase the resilience and to inspire and support young people, by supporting them to reveal more of their potential and flourish within in their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 November 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Underhay | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tim Buttimore | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
James Gallagher | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JONNY WILKINSON | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
SHELLEY LYNETTE JENKINS | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.28k | £30.48k | £5.77k | £21.77k | £40.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.29k | £45.75k | £70.54k | £97.57k | £57.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO :- 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH INCLUDING THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF SICKNESS, DISEASE OR HUMAN SUFFERING AS WELL AS THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT INCLUDING PRESERVATION AND CONSERVATION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT: 3. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4. THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANIMAL WELFARE INCLUDING THE PREVENTION OR SUPPRESSION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS OR THE PRESERVATION OR RELIEF OF SUFFERING BY ANIMALS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 302
Hexham
Northumberland
NE46 9JA
- Phone:
- 07785353095
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window