Financial history URBAN MBA

Charity Number: 1166339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.91k £111.23k £156.13k £117.94k £98.49k
Total expenditure £43.35k £75.84k £111.86k £144.23k £83.02k
Income from government contracts £30.00k £33.00k £14.07k N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £11.00k £2.00k £92.96k N/A