THE FOUR OAKS BOYS' CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the club is to help and educate young people through their leisure time activities so as to develop their physical, mental and spiritual capacities that they may grow to maturity as individuals and members of society and that their coditions of life may be improved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 23 November 1977: Standard registration
- FOUR OAKS CLUB (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Ward | Chair | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Wayne White | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Haslehurst | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Scott Cassell | Trustee | 03 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Sherry | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Christian Payne | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adam White | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.18k | £82.03k | £79.03k | £137.10k | £87.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.46k | £60.12k | £112.98k | £114.16k | £90.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 March 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 SEPTEMBER 1976
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Thomas De Beauchamp Lane
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B73 6DF
- Phone:
- 07983641560
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window