FAMILIES AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Delivering sports activities to young children in order to raise aspirations and provide tailored support toward positive engagement with education, statutory services and community cohesion initiatives. Promoting the positive influence of father figures and male role models with the aim of reducing violence and criminal activity via a bespoke Mentoring Program over 8 sessions per week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 29 March 2016: CIO registration
- FAV (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barrington Anthony Reeves | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linford Sweeney | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Will Forwood | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Dixon | Trustee | 18 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed yassin | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.29k | £91.51k | £2.71k | £158.44k | £129.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.83k | £98.04k | £12.75k | £121.79k | £119.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.42k | £14.93k | N/A | £58.22k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | £53.13k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN GREATER MANCHESTER IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - PROVIDING SUPPORT AND GUIDANCE TO LOCAL YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES SO THAT THEY BECOME MORE EFFECTIVE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY; - ADDRESSING AND REDUCING GANG AND GUN CULTURE IN THE COMMUNITY BY USING A PREVENTATIVE AND EARLY INTERVENTION MODEL; - BRINGING YOUNG PEOPLE TOGETHER WITH THE AIM OF PROMOTING SOCIAL INCLUSION THAT WILL BUILD THEIR SELF-ESTEEM, RAISE THEIR ASPIRATIONS AND ENCOURAGE THEM TO TAKE GREATER RESPONSIBILITY FOR THEIR ACTIONS AND DECISIONS; AND BY - MAKING THE WORK OF THE CHARITY ACCESSIBLE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY ACROSS GREATER MANCHESTER FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Families Against Violence
St. Wilfrids Enterprise Centre
Birchvale Close
MANCHESTER
M15 5BJ
- Phone:
- 0161 868 0112
- Email:
- info@fav-uk.org.uk
- Website:
-
fav-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window