The Russell Kin Trust

Charity Number: 1164503
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To support vocational training for young people and medical research and support for those with cancer.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £32,900
Total expenditure: £44,617

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 November 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • NEEDLES VIEW CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Theresa Ireen Russell Trustee 08 April 2022
None on record
DAVID GERALD RUSSELL Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record
LAURA DADSWELL Trustee 18 May 2015
HAMAMELIS TRUST
Received: On time
THE IVO TRUST
Received: On time
THE DARELL-BROWN, ROBIN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
SAMUEL RUSSELL Trustee 18 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.72k £4.22k £3.16k £18.43k £32.90k
Total expenditure £29.49k £17.88k £16.03k £1.02m £44.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 March 2025 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 28 March 2025 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 03 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Penningtons Manches Cooper Llp
Bottle Works
The Bars
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 4LP
Phone:
01483791800
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available