Financial history LIBERDADE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1163955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £439.03k £712.25k £484.62k £1.45m £2.57m
Total expenditure £467.10k £479.25k £645.29k £771.55k £620.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £177.21k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £210.27k N/A £22.29k £200.17k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £1.34k N/A £35.19k £43.39k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £502.69k N/A £1.23m £2.16m
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A £163.86k £159.76k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £451.69k N/A £633.25k £395.31k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £27.55k N/A £138.30k £224.96k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 N/A £13.52k £25.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0