Financial history ART IN MIND BRIGHTON

Charity Number: 1165326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £32.06k £31.88k £52.13k £35.74k £38.01k
Total expenditure £28.66k £31.80k £36.91k £37.00k £43.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.46k N/A N/A N/A