Financial history COBER HILL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1167215
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £6.43k £6.66k £7.35k £1.02m £962.99k
Total expenditure £750 £50.13k £683 £1.16m £1.02m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.30k £1.08k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £1.01m £958.93k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £5.82k £2.98k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £1.16m £1.02m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £217 £1.04k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £20.84k £11.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £217 £1.04k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £63 £79