THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, SUTTON, IN THE DIOCESE OF CHESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Church of England establishment and run a wide range of Sunday and weekly services. We raise money for the benefit of the church within our local and wider community and we donate money to a wide range of local, national and international charities. We are a non profit making organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

19 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 26 November 2015: Previously excepted registration
- SUTTON ST JAMES PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev John Harries | Chair | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Anna Mary Cerval-Pena | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
David William Potts | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Reece Evans | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Harries | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Davis | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Ethel Easterbrook | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Moss | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Trudi Ray | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Price | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mott | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Gillian Parkinson | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILL DINNIS | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Bullock | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Barber | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bill Massey | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bronwyn Lawrence | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Bonsall | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY MARRIOTT | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £87.89k | £102.99k | £52.15k | £81.48k | £51.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.01k | £91.95k | £76.04k | £243.25k | £71.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 199 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 November 2024 | 389 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 November 2024 | 389 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 December 2023 | 408 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 December 2023 | 408 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2021 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2021 | 228 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JAMES VICARAGE
CHURCH LANE
SUTTON
MACCLESFIELD
SK11 0DS
- Phone:
- 01260253945
- Email:
- vicar@peakparishes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window