THE APEX2100 FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Train and educate elite ski racers to the highest possible standards and provide an accessible resource for athletes, coaches, teachers and the wider skiing community. Apex 2100 Foundation will offer structured coaching facilities aligned with an extensive and rigorous academic programme in Tignes, France.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
Governance
- 16 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE PEGGRAM | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ALEXANDER GRIPTON | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PHILIP BRADSHAW | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £559.26k | £160.32k | £76.05k | £20.85k | £4.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £529.75k | £149.73k | £3.12k | £61.53k | £72.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £113.44k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £445.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £529.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 10 December 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 06 January 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 06 January 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 11 January 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 11 January 2022 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE AND ADVANCE THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, INCLUDING TOGETHER WITH SPECIALISED EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE HIGHEST ORDER IN SNOWSPORTS, BY THE PROMOTION, PROVISION AND CONDUCT IN THE COMMUNITY OF TIGNES, FRANCE, OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, OF A SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE FROM ANY PART OF THE WORLD WITH TALENTS FOR SPORT, AND BY THE PROVISION OF COURSES AT THE SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR; AND (2) TO PROMOTE AMATEUR SNOWSPORTS IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COURSES AND OPPORTUNITIES AT SUCH SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS THROUGHOUT THE YEAR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23
Beaumont Mews
London
W1G 6EN
- Phone:
- 02038296300
- Email:
- info@apex2100.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window