ST. YARED'S TRUST (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Yared's Trust supports The School of St. Yared in Addis Ababa, and its expansion. The Trustees hold fund raising events and campaigns, sources and delivers resources, recruits volunteers, engages with organisations, NGOs, and indivituals for the supply of resources and services for the school both in the UK and Ethiopia, consults with the school's managers on its development strategy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 10 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL BAILEY LLB | Chair | 10 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Bailey B.SC. PH.D | Trustee | 08 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/09/2019 | 09/09/2020 | 09/09/2021 | 09/09/2022 | 09/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.53k | £11.91k | £9.24k | £9.52k | £12.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.04k | £10.24k | £12.25k | £10.27k | £10.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2023 | 10 October 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2021 | 08 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 09 September 2019 | 14 July 2020 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, BUT PARTICULARLY IN ETHIOPIA, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Courts Hill Road
Haslemere
GU27 2NG
- Phone:
- 01428643993
- Email:
- info@styaredstrust.org.uk
- Website:
-
styaredstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.