THE EAST LOOE TOWN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Management and maintenance of public access land and buildings on behalf of the people of Looe; maintaining and supporting the volunteer run museum; supporting pensioners, disabled persons, children and young people etc. in Looe by the provision of facilities, equipment and/or grants according to need and available resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £9,576 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 05 May 2016: CIO registration
- 15 June 2017: Funds received from 234116 THE EAST LOOE TOWN TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW DAVID BISHOP | Chair | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert Philip Lewis | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Samuel Gill | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Samuel James Tanner | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMILE BRIAN GALIPEAU | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JOHN WARNE CB | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Gibson | Trustee | 05 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £237.14k | £276.30k | £261.84k | £253.08k | £272.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.50k | £210.28k | £263.30k | £359.49k | £246.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £8.00k | £8.80k | £8.80k | £9.28k | £9.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £35.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 May 2016 as amended on 28 Sep 2022 as amended on 28 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC: ? IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF LOOE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM; ? BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SERVICES FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UNDER 25 BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, FACILITIES AND SERVICES. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE BEACH, SEAFRONT AND WOOLDOWN, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; 3. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING BY PROMOTING BIO DIVERSITY; 4. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS; 5. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 6. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE THE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO AGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS’ IN THE AREA COVERED BY LOOE TOWN COUNCIL BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EAST LOOE TOWN TRUST
THE GUILDHALL
FORE STREET
EAST LOOE
LOOE
PL131AA
- Phone:
- 01503263709
- Email:
- info@eastlooetowntrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window