YOUTH WITH A MISSION THE KING'S LODGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education and training Accommodation and housing Religious activities Economic/community development/employment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 February 2016: Standard registration
- YWAM THE KING'S LODGE (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JAMES LEAGE | Chair | 11 February 2016 |
|
|||||
Eileen Jackson | Trustee | 20 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Bolton | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kiwon Kwon | Trustee | 16 September 2022 |
|
|||||
David Antony Fawcett | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Taryn Cooper | Trustee | 18 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Marie Mancini | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Michael Foster | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DENISE SLOAN | Trustee | 11 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £312.38k | £227.10k | £231.38k | £322.12k | £331.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £283.89k | £231.11k | £298.36k | £310.35k | £338.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/11/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 SEP 2017 as amended on 15 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") WHICH ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EVANGELICAL CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE; AND (2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
YOUTH WITH A MISSION
KINGS LODGE
WATLING STREET
NUNEATON
CV10 0TZ
- Phone:
- 02476348128
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window