MADINATUN NOOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious and Educational Services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 22 February 2016: Standard registration
- AN NOOR INTERNATIONAL (Previous name)
- MADINATUN NOOR AL KHAIRIYAH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HAFIZ SYED NAEM AHMAD | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
SYED RIAZ AHMAD | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|||||
HAFIJ MAWLANA SYED TAMIM AHMAD | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZUBAIR AHMED CHOUDHURY | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.29k | £79.81k | £88.29k | £92.56k | £109.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.01k | £63.33k | £67.70k | £76.59k | £84.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 August 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 August 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2016 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF CHILDREN, POOR FAMILIES AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN BANGLADESH IN PARTICULAR BY MEANS OF FINANCIAL AND NON-FINANCIAL SUPPORT/ASSISTANCE OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
787 High Road
Ilford
Essex
IG3 8RW
- Phone:
- 07737715020
- Email:
- info@madinatunnoor.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window