Trustees ILKLEY CONCERT CLUB
Charity Number: 506886

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Skidmore | Chair | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
David Charles Halpin | Trustee | 14 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
DONALD JAMES WILLIAMS | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Templar | Trustee | 15 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Harris | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Bridgewater | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER RUNDLE | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH LOUISE WARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE WESLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR A P HUDSON | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.