THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE BLIND AND DISABLED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support and transport for outings to the coast or other places of interest to our members. We provide safe transport to enable our members to go out with friends to bingo halls, restaurants, theatre etc in the evening. Support and provide our members with transport for hospital and home visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 September 1994: Standard registration
- THE ASSOCIATION OF FRIENDS OF THE BLIND (LEEDS) (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH EGAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SCARLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.22k | £24.75k | £19.64k | £20.14k | £18.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.77k | £19.11k | £17.07k | £23.05k | £23.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2022 | 276 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 8 SEPTEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED 30 OCTOBER 1987.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEANS AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS AND DISABLED PERSONS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT TO PROVIDE SPORTS AND SOCIAL ACTIVITIES AND HELP FOR ALL BLIND PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 26 September 1994 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
266 NORTH PARKWAY
LEEDS
LS14 6PX
- Phone:
- 01132730013
- Email:
- susanscarlett1@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window