PUKKA PONIES EQUINE RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO OFFER SANCTUARY TO EQUINES IN NEED, PROVISION OF CARE, VETERINARY TREATMENT AND ALL ASSOCIATED DUTIES. WHERE SUITABLE TO REHOME EQUINES INTO APPROVED HOMES, AND MAINTAIN A RELATIONSHIP TO SAFEGUARD THEIR FUTURE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Essex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 21 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH DANIELL | Chair | 17 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Wyld | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rhiannon Ideson | Trustee | 07 July 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.51k | £8.68k | £18.23k | £5.99k | £17.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.99k | £17.90k | £19.27k | £6.48k | £18.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 JAN 2014
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS, SPECIFICALLY EQUINES, IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND, IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN RESCUE HOMES OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH EQUINES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stables
West Farleigh
Maidstone
Kent
ME15 0NL
- Phone:
- 07543111373
- Email:
- pukkaponies@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window