Financial history LIVING WORD INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1165611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £92.23k £105.76k £126.26k £173.37k £177.65k
Total expenditure £73.89k £73.67k £117.66k £157.71k £157.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A