Financial history SUBULUS SALAAM

Charity number: 1168638
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £16.77k £20.32k £16.65k £13.60k £17.93k
Total expenditure £12.21k £23.36k £12.78k £28.44k £15.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A