Accounts and annual returns CHESS KNIGHTS

Charity number: 1169139
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2020 06 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2019 05 March 2021 339 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 May 2018 19 March 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 03 April 2019 3 days late