ASSOCIATION FOR THE GLOBAL ADVANCEMENT OF ENT SURGERY AND HEAD AND NECK CANCER RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our various research projects have moved forward, in particular the Bench-to-Bedside Head and Neck Cancer Research Programme at UCL Cancer Institute. We are also working to continue to improve awareness of HPV-associated oropharyngeal cancer through public health education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
- India
- Indonesia
Governance
- 05 February 2016: CIO registration
- AGA-ENT (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MATT LECHNER MD PhDFRCS | Chair | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Paul O'Flynn | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR VALERIE LUND CBE | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS VAZ FRCS | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/07/2020 | 24/07/2021 | 24/07/2022 | 24/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.50k | £6.79k | £3.76k | £1.75k | £104.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.58k | £344 | £5.15k | £6.81k | £93.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2023 | 28 June 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2022 | 25 May 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 July 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 July 2020 | 13 August 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 05 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF SICKNESS IN THE FIELD OF EAR, NOSE AND THROAT/HEAD AND NECK SURGERY AND HEAD AND NECK DISORDERS ACROSS THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: · SUPPORTING THE PROVISION OF AWARENESS AND SCREENING PROGRAMMES · SUPPORTING CANCER RESEARCH BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Kershen Fairfax Ltd
4th Floor
Eldon Chambers
30-32 Fleet Street
London
- Phone:
- 02079306576
- Email:
- info@aga-ent.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window