OLD AGE CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Old Age Care is providing advice on struggles they may face in day to day life. We will be providing advice on living independently, loneliness and working with technology. The organisation will also redirect the people to the local councils, social services or health care professionals on going into a care home, getting stair lifts, walking frames, walking sticks, disability allowance etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Brent
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 22 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR MOHAMMAD SHAHRAZAD PHD | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
DR EMMA GHAFFARI PHD | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/06/2020 | 11/06/2021 | 11/06/2022 | 11/06/2023 | 11/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30 | £175 | £100 | £100 | £70 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10 | £30 | £30 | £30 | £30 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2024 | 02 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2022 | 20 April 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 11 June 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 June 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 22 Feb 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS LIVING IN HILLINGDON, UXBRIDGE, HARROW AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
198 Westfield
Harlow
CM18 6AW
- Phone:
- 07850655864
- Email:
- oldagecareuk@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window