FARMERS OVERSEAS ACTION GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Vision is that rural Ugandans are healthy, educated and prosperous. Our Mission is to create a better future for rural Ugandans by supporting income-generating activities which allow families to afford healthcare, education and food.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Uganda
Governance
- 08 December 2015: CIO registration
- 11 May 2016: Funds received from 802676 FARMERS OVERSEAS ACTION GROUP
- FOAG (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM THOMAS SURMAN | Chair | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Jane Dean | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Charles Alexander Frazer Letts | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN STURDY | Trustee | 16 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR MIKE BENTLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
NABIL JAMOUS | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|||||
JANE CHRISTINE STURDY | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS CHRISSY BENTLEY | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN MCCONVILLE | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.08k | £151.69k | £83.44k | £94.04k | £24.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.70k | £101.33k | £132.53k | £88.64k | £29.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA THROUGH ENABLING AND EMPOWERING FARMERS AND RURAL COMMUNITIES BY PROVIDING GRANTS, SOCIAL INVESTMENT, PRACTICAL HELP, EDUCATION AND SUPPORT WITHIN THE KEY SECTORS OF AGRICULTURE, HEALTH AND EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD RECTORY
STANFORD BRIDGE
WORCESTER
WR6 6SH
- Phone:
- 01886853295
- Email:
- info@foag.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window