WESTON-SUPER-MARE AND BURNHAM-ON-SEA METHODIST CIRCUIT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

29 Trustee(s)
330 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Somerset
- Somerset
Governance
- 09 December 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Steven Andrew Bennett | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Rev Judith Lincoln | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Lynn Daniels | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Moore | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Missen | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Gregory | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janice Barrett | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GORDON LEGG | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Trebble | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adele Lloyd | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
GEOFF STAIT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET FRYER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN TUPPER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN TREBBLE | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN HUNT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE THOMAS | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BALDWIN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY KRULL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||
CELIA DEWFALL | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUDY ALLEN | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAT BIDMEAD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY BAKER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER LUKER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA GODDARD | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JILL LEGG | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLARAINE CLARK | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SCOTT | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILL POULTER | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jill Bethel | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.43k | £218.87k | £331.05k | £134.51k | £60.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £163.73k | £207.09k | £268.71k | £199.72k | £187.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 01/01/1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE PURPOSES DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION BEING A SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
143A Berrow Road
BURNHAM-ON-SEA
Somerset
TA8 2PN
- Phone:
- 01278784808
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
wsmbos.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window