GLOBAL MIRACLE GOSPEL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of our charity is to advance the Christian faith by proclaiming the gospel and to provide teaching and training for Christians and those want to follow the Christian faith and to support all members of our local community through various community programmes and outreaches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 April 2016: Standard registration
- GMGM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DRUSILLA TAYLOR-LEWIS | Chair | 08 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA TENDERE | Trustee | 08 August 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/07/2020 | 07/07/2021 | 07/07/2022 | 07/07/2023 | 07/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.19k | £16.59k | £18.67k | £19.87k | £18.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.95k | £15.47k | £17.48k | £18.56k | £16.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 July 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 July 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 July 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 July 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 AUG 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN PARTICULAR BY PROCLAIMING THE GOSPEL AND TO PROVIDE TEACHING AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIANS BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 -102 Fore Street
Edmonton
LONDON
N18 2XA
- Phone:
- 07958744570
- Email:
- enquiries@gmgm.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window