PILGRIMS CHRISTIAN COMMUNITY FARM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pilgrims provides sessions for people with mental health difficulties using horses and other animals to bring relief, create community and reduce isolation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 04 December 2015: CIO registration
- PILGRIMS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Maragret Verne | Chair | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shan Richards | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Gary Verne | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MARGARET EVANS BA. MA. | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.30k | £373 | £109 | £36 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.81k | £2.94k | £2.94k | £0 | £2.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 02 February 2025 | 155 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO RELIEVE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF MENTAL ILLNESS AND TO PROVIDE RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THEM WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND BEFRIENDING THEM THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY FARM BASED ON CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clock Cottage
Bush Heath Road
Harbury
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
CV33 9NN
- Phone:
- 07779355991
- Email:
- pilgrimsfarm@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window