THE FRIENDS OF ROSS HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The friends of Ross Hospital current activities are to raise funds by organising coffee mornings, street collections, an annual hospital garden fete and shop sales. These funds go to benefit patients in the hospital and local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 11 November 1977: Standard registration
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ROSS-ON-WYE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- ROSS ON WYE COTTAGE HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIAN COLE | Chair | 08 February 2013 |
|
|||||
Jane Josephine Hudson | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JEAN WHITTINGHAM | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
WENDY PROCTOR | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RAVENSCROFT DAVID | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY OSBORNE | Trustee | 21 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CICELY SYMONDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL URSELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.72k | £11.31k | £10.81k | £18.61k | £17.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.55k | £4.46k | £11.34k | £5.79k | £35.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 14 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/11/1973 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/11/1993 AS AMENDED ON 14/11/1996 AS AMENDED ON 26/11/2009 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE ROSS HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
ROSS-ON-WYE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
ALTON STREET
ROSS ON WYE
HR9 5AB
- Phone:
- 01989562100
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window