LLANRUMNEY HALL COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO LEAD THE RESTORATION OF GRADE 2* LISTED LLANRUMNEY HALL INTO A COMMUNITY AND EDUCATION HUB.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £35,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cardiff
Governance
- 14 January 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN BORLEY | Chair | 29 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Lee Bridgeman | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|||||
John Couzens | Trustee | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jo Parker | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
RUPERT THOMAS | Trustee | 17 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA BORLEY | Trustee | 29 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.01k | £130.32k | £315.59k | £482.53k | £326.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £155.10k | £212.55k | £322.33k | £467.23k | £338.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.73k | N/A | £262.46k | £35.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 04 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 08 December 2020 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 08 December 2020 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/01/2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF LLANRUMNEY IN CARDIFF AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Llanrumney Hall Communiuty Trust
Ball Road
Llanrumney
CARDIFF
CF3 4JJ
- Phone:
- 02920001441
- Email:
- info@llanrumneyhall.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window