HARROW TOGETHER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Harrow Together is a consortium working to strengthen the voluntary & community sector. We provide an opportunity for Harrow organisations to work in partnership to secure larger contracts. Harrow Giving funds, supports and empowers a range of diverse local projects to make a positive difference in the lives of Harrow residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,279,812
Donations and legacies | £10.20k | |
Charitable activities | £1.27m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £60 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,061,789
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.06m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,233,299 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.06m | |
Retained for future use | £218.02k |
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Harrow
Governance
- 22 June 2016: Standard registration
- HARROW GIVING (Working name)
- HCA (Working name)
- HARROW COMMUNITY ACTION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN MURPHY | Chair | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colin Vincent Powell | Trustee | 25 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lavanya Marya | Trustee | 24 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Kennard | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Ware | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Tracy Bennett | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kulwinder Singh-Rai | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glen Justin Hearnden | Trustee | 29 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julian Francis Lloyd | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dan Burke | Trustee | 12 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR DEVEN PILLAY | Trustee | 05 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wright | Trustee | 28 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £260.78k | £1.58m | £965.14k | £1.05m | £1.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £285.68k | £1.36m | £943.16k | £1.13m | £1.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £185.40k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.50k | £1.16m | £675.79k | N/A | £1.23m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £18.57k | £13.92k | £16.98k | £10.20k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.56m | £951.07k | £1.03m | £1.27m | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £60 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £152 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £1.36m | £943.16k | £1.13m | £1.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £10.61k | £25.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £510.30k | £693.60k | £406.90k | £486.50k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £238.57k | £399.90k | £201.70k | £63.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 JUN 2016 as amended on 17 Oct 2018 as amended on 24 Nov 2021 as amended on 28 Nov 2022 as amended on 03 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS, VOLUNTARY GROUPS AND CHARITIES OPERATING IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HARROW AND ELSEWHERE (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY: (A) CO-ORDINATING BOTH EXISTING CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE AGENCIES THAT HAVE A COMMON GOAL TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEEDS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; AND (B) LIAISING WITH, AND ACTING AS A FORUM FOR, THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION BETWEEN AGENCIES WORKING IN A GIVEN FIELD TO RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEEDS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. NOT-FOR-PROFIT ORGANISATIONS AND VOLUNTARY GROUPS ARE INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY ORGANISATIONS. CHARITIES ARE ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Voluntary Action Harrow
The Lodge
64 Pinner Road
HARROW
HA1 4HZ
- Phone:
- 02088615894
- Email:
- info@harrowtogether.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window