THREE RIVERS MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust promotes and preserves for the benefit of the public a museum and local studies centre with material of archaeological, historical, artistic and social interests and importance to the people of Three Rivers district in Hertfordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 December 2015: Standard registration
- TRMT (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Julia North | Trustee | 28 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Sarah Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fabian Henry Hiscock | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Elizabeth Roffe | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY HAMILTON | Trustee | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR LES MEAD | Trustee | 20 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL COLLINS BAhonsFCCA | Trustee | 08 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANN VERNAU | Trustee | 12 April 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.65k | £23.14k | £8.11k | £7.99k | £4.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.98k | £3.08k | £7.28k | £14.66k | £6.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 133 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 MAR 1994
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA KNOWN AS THREE RIVERS IN THE COUNTY OF HERTFORDSHIRE BY THE PROVISION OF A MUSEUM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 HIGH STREET
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 1ER
- Phone:
- 01923775882
- Email:
- info@trmt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window