Accounts and annual returns RAINBOW SCHOOLS LTD

Charity number: 1168048
Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days
Annual return 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days
Annual return 31 October 2021 23 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 03 September 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 23 March 2021 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required