LYMM HERITAGE INFORMATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the charity is to advance the education of the public by providing and maintaining a heritage centre and museum for the exhibition to the public of objects,documents, photographs and other items connected with the history of Lymm, Cheshire and surrounding district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Warrington
Governance
- 22 December 2015: CIO registration
- LHIC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN RICHARD WILLIAMS | Chair | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Kellett | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham | Trustee | 23 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Linnell | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK KNOWLES | Trustee | 30 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GLYNIS ALLEN | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.74k | £46.61k | £52.45k | £24.42k | £20.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.64k | £40.84k | £26.59k | £27.56k | £24.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | £13.33k | £16.57k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 22 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A HERITAGE CENTRE AND MUSEUM FOR THE EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF OBJECTS, DOCUMENTS, PHOTOGRAPHS AND OTHER ITEMS CONNECTED WITH THE HISTORY OF LYMM, CHESHIRE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Legh Street
LYMM
WA13 0DA
- Phone:
- 01925754080
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window