The Greenwoods Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to organisations and individuals which are in need of financial support for such objects and purposes in any part of the world as are exclusively charitable in accordance with the laws of England and Wales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 May 2016: Standard registration
- THE GORDON DADDS CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- THE INCE GROUP CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Yates | Trustee | 11 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MAY PETERS | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Oonagh Alen-Buckley | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
AMELIA BERINGER | Trustee | 08 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.15k | £118.90k | £139.10k | £35.12k | £30.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.13k | £71.20k | £96.85k | £85.89k | £18.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 April 2025 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 April 2023 | 62 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 SEP 2010 as amended on 25 Sep 2019 as amended on 25 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWOODS LEGAL LLP
QUEENS HOUSE
55-56 LINCOLN'S INN FIELDS
LONDON
WC2A 3LJ
- Phone:
- 02075180248
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window