BOSTON CONCERT CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise a subscription series of six chamber music concerts each year from October to March. Prior to the pandemic, many of our visiting artists also visited local schools, mainly primary, to give educational workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 25 November 1977: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHLEY LAWRENCE GROOMBRIDGE | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH LAWRENCE FOSTER OSBORNE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MICHAEL CLARKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
VERONICA RUTH ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDITH CLAIRE WARNES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GERALD ANTHONY MIDDLETON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN JOHN BOYCOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.39k | £1.18k | £6.18k | £5.12k | £6.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.47k | £321 | £5.83k | £5.96k | £5.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1977CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 OCTOBER 1977 AS DATED 6 JUNE 1978
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PROMOTION AND PRESENTATION OF PROFESSIONAL CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 ROCHFORD TOWER LANE
BOSTON
PE21 9RQ
- Phone:
- 01205367111
- Email:
- bostonconcertclub@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window