DAVENTRY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the residents of Daventry and the neighbourhood with the provision of a community centre for voluntary and other organisations to advance education and provide for wellbeing, social welfare and recreation leisure time activities. To manage and maintain the centre to the highest standards whilst keeping rents to affordable levels for the widest possible use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 January 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE TUBB | Chair | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MOLONEY | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
EMMA PETTIT | Trustee | 21 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR ADAM SIDAT | Trustee | 05 April 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.31k | £165.45k | £135.18k | £134.48k | £152.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £116.77k | £130.84k | £106.37k | £141.73k | £127.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 August 2024 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 August 2024 | 417 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 August 2024 | 419 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 30 June 2022 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Jan 2016
Charitable objects
THE CIO'S OBJECTS ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DAVENTRY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daventry Community Centre
Ashby Road
DAVENTRY
Northamptonshire
NN11 0QE
- Phone:
- 01327702423
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window