LODSWORTH LOCAL CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve those members of the Parish of Lodsworth who are either experiencing financial burdens, unable to travel independently or requiring assitance to access certain core services, mainly, in the health arena. We provide assistance with transport to and from medical and dental appointments; collection of prescriptions, provision of certain mobility aids plus access to external agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 17 December 2015: CIO registration
- LLC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sally Ann Stimpson | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cahill | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £607 | £0 | £382 | £1.81k | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £568 | £621 | £1.19k | £838 | £644 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 11 November 2020 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 17 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE PARISH OF LODSWORTH WHO ARE ELDERLY, POOR, PEOPLE WITH YOUNG CHILDREN OR LIVING IN ISOLATED AREAS OF THE PARISH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE, ACCESS TO MOBILITY EQUIPMENT AND DEFIBRILLATORS, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Netherfield
Vicarage Lane
Lodsworth
PETWORTH
West Sussex
GU28 9DF
- Phone:
- 07783051095
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window