STOCKTON AND THORNABY CANOE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, in particular by the provision of facilities for all aspects of the sport of canoeing and paddle sports (the terms 'paddle sports' and 'canoeing' are inclusive of all forms of canoeing and kayaking).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 10 November 2015: CIO registration
- STCC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harry Peers | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Hopwood | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Oliver | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Ian Robertson | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Robertson | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Michael Howe | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.89k | £6.39k | £8.77k | £14.55k | £12.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.27k | £6.50k | £5.66k | £11.16k | £14.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 February 2023 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 10 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN STOCKTON-ON–TEES BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF CANOEING AND PADDLE SPORT (THE TERM ‘PADDLE SPORT’ AND ‘CANOEING’ ARE INCLUSIVE OF ALL FORMS OF CANOEING AND KAYAKING).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stockton & Thornaby CC
Tees Barrage
STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Cleveland
TS18 2QW
- Phone:
- 07828884459
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window