THE CLARE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Peer support and signposting for those questioning their gender identity or struggling with gender norms in society. We provide safe spaces to nurture and inform as well as providing information to individuals seeking to change their assigned gender. Activities include drop in support groups, psychotherapeutic support, health and social care advice and advocacy services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 February 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Allen | Chair | 05 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Preston-Dunlop | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lily Dommett | Trustee | 03 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Fonfara | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andie Davidson | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.02k | £106.38k | £132.54k | £193.31k | £245.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.72k | £81.19k | £118.67k | £173.40k | £241.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.05k | £850 | £13.43k | £14.16k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED TO CIO FOUNDATION 06 DEC 2021 AMENDED ON 05 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE WHO ARE OR WHO IDENTIFY AS TRANSGENDER AND THOSE WHO SUPPORT THEM BY PROVIDING A SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENT FOR PEOPLE TO EXPLORE ISSUES SURROUNDING THEIR GENDER IDENTITY AND TO BE AFFIRMED IN THEIR JOURNEY THROUGH A WEEKLY DROP IN; PSYCHOTHERAPEUTIC SUPPORT; CRISIS SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dorset Gardens Methodist Church
Dorset Gardens
BRIGHTON
BN2 1RL
- Phone:
- 01273234779
- Email:
- info@clareproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window