ROYAL NAVY RUGBY UNION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The over-riding aim is to 'promote and foster' the game of rugby within the Naval Service by: Promoting the physical efficiency of members of the Naval Service by providing facilities and other encouragement to participate in the game of rugby football; Making grants for charitable purposes; Promoting amateur sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 2016: Standard registration
- 15 October 2017: Funds received from 249182 THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES RUGBY UNION TRUST
- RNRU (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REAR ADM MATTHEW JOHN PARR CB | Chair | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Godfrey Higham | Trustee | 01 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Emma Sinden | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Andrew Reid | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Steven Mark Richard Moorhouse OBE | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cdr Kirsty Marlor | Trustee | 03 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Ellen Oakley | Trustee | 24 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANGUS BUJALSKI | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.61k | £197.67k | £1.36m | £1.39m | £499.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £613.02k | £219.47k | £1.11m | £1.10m | £358.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £99.46k | £124.56k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £1.14m | £1.24m | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £120.12k | £20.39k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £393.37k | £355.88k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £718.36k | £745.10k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £4.24k | £6.01k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 29 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 SEP 2015
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTING THE PHYSICAL EFFICIENCY OF MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL NAVY, THE ROYAL MARINES, THE NAVAL RESERVE FORCES AND ALL OTHER FORCES AS DEFINED IN THE QUEEN'S REGULATIONS FOR THE ROYAL NAVY AS BELONGING TO THE NAVAL SERVICE BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OTHER ENCOURAGEMENT FOR ALL RANKS THEREOF TO PARTICIPATE IN THE GAME OF RUGBY FOOTBALL. (B) MAKING GRANTS FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES THAT BENEFIT EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY MEMBERS BOTH PAST AND PRESENT OF THE NAVAL SERVICE. (C) PROMOTING AMATEUR SPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING PARTICIPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE GAME OF RUGBY FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
H M S Temeraire
Burnaby Road
Portsmouth
PO1 2HB
- Phone:
- 02392573040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window