PONTEFRACT GENERAL INFIRMARY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 09 May 1984: Standard registration
- 31 October 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- P G I LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- PONTEFRACT GENERAL INFIRMARY AND HEADLANDS HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- PONTEFRACT GENERAL INFIRMARY AND HEADLANDS HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (NOW KNOWN AS "PONTEFRACT GENERAL INFIRMARY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS") (Previous name)
- PONTEFRACT GENERAL INFIRMARY LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.97k | £23.88k | £6.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.24k | £24.50k | £23.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 27 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 07 March 2005 | 35 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 1984 AS AMENDED 5 MAY 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL(S) WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCEENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL(S). (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3(A)-(L).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window