FRIENDLY BAND (SOWERBY BRIDGE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a Brass Band based in Sowerby Bridge. We provide free tuition and instruments to anybody wishing to take up playing a brass instrument and are available for any function. We raise our own funds through concerts and receive no external funding. We provide a social activity for all ages from 5 years to 90 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Calderdale
Governance
- 07 December 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Eaton Walker | Chair | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Brundell | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Claire Webster | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG JEREMY LAWRANCE | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JAYNE ELIZABETH LAWRANCE | Trustee | 08 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.87k | £13.52k | £40.11k | £23.51k | £16.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.14k | £21.91k | £9.57k | £18.07k | £21.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.67k | £4.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 07 Dec 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, CONCERTS AND RECITALS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 Coley View
Northowram
HALIFAX
HX3 7EB
- Phone:
- 07702616137
- Email:
- enquiries@friendlyband.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window