Accounts and annual returns FAWDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506926
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 15 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 22 February 2013 22 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 17 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 16 May 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 17 January 2011 On Time